Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Balestriere Pllc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Schmidt, Matthew William, against Ames Ray, David B Anziska, represented by Anziska, David B, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Richard G. Latin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard G. Latin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Malicious Prosecution) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 12, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 04, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: December 04, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: July 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 18, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 12, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Reply Ex. A - June 30, 2023 Letter |
||
December 04, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
December 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 20, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) Jury Verdict Form |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Transcript - January 30, 2023 |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) Balestriere PLLC v. Rubin |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Transcript - March 13, 2019 |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Anziska Letter, dated January 22, 2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.