Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jeffrey Espinal, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Subin, Herbert S, against Allied Realty Corp., Allied Realty Xvii Llc, Danny Hakakian, Shuli Becker, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 08, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 25, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 19, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 28, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 25, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 25, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 08, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
June 08, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.