Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Priscilla Martinez, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Huttner, Lee Michael, Subin, Herbert S, against Cats 3531 Broadway, Llc, Rite Aid Of New York City Inc., represented by Benson, Kristen Michelle, Rubine, Seth Brian, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Paul A. Goetz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul A. Goetz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 26, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 15, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2020CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Discovery Responses
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 07, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 02, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Response
Date: January 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 07, 2021STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: January 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 07, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 19, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 26, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 30, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 17, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: June 17, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Discovery Responses
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 13, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 20, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Response Letter dated July 9, 2021
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 09, 2021RJI (AMENDED)
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE
Date: April 04, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 17, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) PROPOSED STIP-ORDER - proposed Stip [TO BE SO ORDERED] - DATED 2.16.2023 |
||
January 17, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
May 13, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 04, 2022 | NOTICE | ||
September 18, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE - TT's Response to PC Order dated 9.18.2021 |
||
September 03, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
August 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
August 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - via NYSCEF and Email |
||
August 20, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Preliminary Conference Order |
||
August 17, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) STIPULATION - Amending Caption - to be "so Ordered" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.