Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dena Nash, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sarshik, Steven B, against Upright Citizens Brigade, Llc, represented by Linefsky, Miles Alexander, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lori S. Sattler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLori S. Sattler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 07, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: August 02, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 02, 2022ANSWER
Date: December 29, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 09, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 27, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 27, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 15, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 09, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Submitted to Court for e-filing |
||
September 09, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 19, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service on Dena Nash |
||
August 19, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service on Defendant's Attorneys |
||
August 15, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
August 02, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) *Corrected* Order to Show Cause to be relieved as counsel |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Copy of Answer |
||
August 02, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation of Plaintiff's Attorney in Support |
||
August 02, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Copy of Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.