Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zabrina Naranjo, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Goldberg, Michael M, against Columbia University, Rocco B. Commisso Soccer Stadium, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Richman, David E, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lyle E Frank presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLyle E Frank Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ANSWER
Date: October 28, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 04, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 09, 2020 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 09, 2020 | answer to NYC Cross-Claims | ||
November 04, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
October 28, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
October 28, 2020 |
DEMAND FOR: Verified BP, disclosure of medicare, witness information, Party statements, authorizations, notice t Verified BP, disclosure of medicare, witness information, Party statements, authorizations, notice t ... show more |
||
October 19, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
July 14, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
June 08, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.