Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Steven Jimenez, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Liakas, Dean Nicholas, Versoza, Joshua Lorenzo, against 315 Seventh Residential L.L.C., Maxwell Kates, Inc., The 315 Seventh Avenue Condominium, T-Mobile Usa, Inc., represented by Neves, William Cirne, Picone, Noelle Irwin, Sjoquist, Chad E, Sohnen, Daniel Y, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lisa S. Headley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa S. Headley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligence) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 24, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: June 21, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 30, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 24, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 12, 2021ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: September 30, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 22, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 11, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 12, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 07, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: January 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: November 09, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Relevant portion of condominium declaration and by-laws |
||
December 08, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Affidavit In Further Support of Motion To Dismiss |
||
December 07, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation In Further Support of Motion To Dismiss |
||
December 06, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) T-MOBILE USA, INC.S Affirmation in Partial Support of 315 SEVENTH RESIDENTIAL LLC's Motion |
||
November 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
November 30, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 30, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Word Count |
||
November 09, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) Fifteenth Amendment to Offering Plan |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Offering Plan to Subject Building (1st page) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.