Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Grogan, Taylor Alyssa, O'Leary, Kevin William, Siegel, Jeffrey Scott, against 5 Borough Anesthesia, Pllc, Acutus Rx, Llc, Advanced Comprehensive Laboratory Llc D B A Toplab, Amilor Acupuncture P.C., Benessere Services Inc, (total of 32) See All represented by Neuwirth, Steven Jay, Padrucco, Joseph J., Rybak, Oleg, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Debra A. James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ANSWER
Date: July 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020SUMMONS
Date: June 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: September 08, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #001) Denials of defaulting defendants
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001) Police Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001) Bill/no-fault application Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001) No-Fault Application - Holmes
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 12, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 28, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 17, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 20, 2021STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 14, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 09, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 04, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 07, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: April 19, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002) Certified police report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 18, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Discovery Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #002) Bills Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 25, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 31, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 25, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 12, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 02, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
September 28, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
September 20, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Status Conference Order |
||
August 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Discovery Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Discovery Responses Redacted |
||
August 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Affirmation in Reply to Rybak Defendants' Opposition |
||
August 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Coney Island Psychology PC's Discovery Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR Coney Island Psychology PC's Discovery Responses Redacted |
||
August 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) PC Order |
||
August 31, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Citimedical I, PLLC's Discovery Responses Redacted per 22 NYCRR Citimedical I, PLLC's Discovery Responses Redacted |
||
July 27, 2022 |
ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002) Request that Summary Judgment Motion adj |
||
July 25, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.