Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Amba Capital Ventures, Inc., Anderson Inniss, Inniss Construction, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Berlowitz, Allan J, Cole, Adam David, Fingold, Joshua Eric, against David Farrell, Signature Bank, represented by Dolan, Matthew Patrick, Grantz, David B, Graziadei, Frank M, Gross, Aaron C, Heffernan, Michael John, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Andrew Borrok presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2020ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020LETTER APPLICATION TO ADMINISTRATIVE JUDGE REQUESTING ASSIGNMENT TO COMMERCIAL DIVISION
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (POST RJI)
Date: October 26, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER GRANTING/DENYING REQUEST TO ASSIGN CASE TO COMMERCIAL DIVISION
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: March 06, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: December 09, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 12, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 16, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: September 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 08, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 08, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 26, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: November 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 08, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: January 24, 2022ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: January 25, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 12, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 22, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 24, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 22, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: March 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 27, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004) CDN Checks - Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: January 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005) *Corrected*
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 10, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: February 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 02, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: July 23, 2021REMITTITUR
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 29, 2022REMITTITUR
Date: March 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 02, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 17, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: October 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 01, 2022NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: September 07, 2021STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 16, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 09, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 20, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 27, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 01, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: May 17, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 26, 2020ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 06, 2023ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: February 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 15, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 15, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 15, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
March 16, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 15, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
March 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #008) Dept. of Financial Services Announcement of Seizure of Sig Bank |
||
March 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #008) Pleadings |
||
March 15, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #008) Fingold Affirmation in Support |
||
March 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #008) Latest discovery order |
||
March 15, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #008) FDIC Announcement of Creation of Signature Bridge Bank |
||
March 15, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
February 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #007) Affirmation of Service of Order to Show Cause and supporting documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.