Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lauren Perkins, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Dell, Joseph Gerard, against 184 Thompson Street Owner Llc, Douglas Elliman Property Management, The Board Of Managers Of The 184 Thompson Condominium, The Metropolitan Commercial Real Estate Association, Inc., represented by Brill, Haydn Julian, Meade, John Steger, Rankin, Carolyn S., Schwartzberg, Martin Arthur, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lisa S. Headley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
This is a complaint filed in New York alleging negligence related to toxic mold. Plaintiff is Lauren Perkins of New Hampshire and defendants are 184 Thompson Street Owner LLC, The Board of Managers of the 184 Thompson Condominium, Douglas Elliman Pro...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001) employment documents
Date: November 21, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) Authorizations Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001) mold toxicity report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001) authorizations Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) mold toxicity report Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 21, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 10, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 29, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2023SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: April 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 16, 2023NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: August 16, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 02, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 24, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 05, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 13, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 05, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 18, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: April 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 04, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 16, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 02, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 05, 2023REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) employment documents employment documents Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Authorizations Redacted per 22 NYCRR Authorizations Redacted |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) employment documents Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR employment documents Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) mold toxicity report Redacted per 22 NYCRR mold toxicity report Redacted |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) authorizations Redacted per 22 NYCRR authorizations Redacted |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Bill of Particulars |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Bill of Particulars |
||
November 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) mold toxicity report Redacted per 22 NYCRR mold toxicity report Redacted |
||
November 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.