Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jason Jenkins, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Suris, Raymond Joseph, against Marc J Lust, represented by Harrington, Edward J, Rosedale, Rebecca June, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lisa S. Headley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: May 19, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 14, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 20, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: December 31, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 14, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: March 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIP OF DISC |
||
December 31, 2020 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
September 14, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 14, 2020 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST PC request and good faith affirmation |
||
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | answer with bp | |
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Summons and Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.