Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Elie Pierre, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Andrea, Frank A, against 3 World Trade Center, Llc, Group M Worldwide, Inc., Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey, Silverstein Properties, Inc., represented by Howansky, Ihor P, Monk, Glenn Alexander, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Kotler, Hon. Lynn R. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Trip And Fall/Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 03, 2020ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: April 23, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: September 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 15, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 18, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT | ||
September 15, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re Third Party Summons & Complaint |
||
July 06, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Held IAS Part 8 Supreme Initial (first time on); SEE, (NYSCEF DOC. NO.9) (Conversion) Judge: Kotler, Hon. Lynn R. |
|
June 25, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 15, 2021 | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | ||
April 23, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) | ||
January 11, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.