Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Barbara Linn, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ashe, Adam Scott, Renna, Robert J., against The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, D'Cunha, Stacy Patrick, Morano, Cory Morgan, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Judy Kim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Slip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: September 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 14, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 09, 2018URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 08, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 09, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 10, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 18, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 24, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 16, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 09, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 5 DCM 2PM (Conversion) Judge: Ramseur, Hon. Dakota D. |
|
April 28, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 5 DCM 2PM Judge: RAMSEUR, DAKOTA D. (DCM) |
|
March 19, 2020 | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | ||
February 10, 2020 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Held COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 5 DCM Supreme Trial; 2PM (Conversion) Judge: Ramseur, Hon. Dakota D. |
|
January 28, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 5 DCM 2PM Judge: RAMSEUR, DAKOTA D. (DCM) |
|
January 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A of Parks Affidavit/Parks Search |
||
January 08, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT Response to CC Stipulation Dated 10/16/19 |
||
October 16, 2019 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Held COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 5 DCM Supreme Trial; 2 PM (Conversion) Judge: Saunders, Hon. Verna L. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.