Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rosa Benitez, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Pirotin, Sanford Lance, against City Of New York, New York City Department Of Transportation, represented by Bila, Anthony, Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with J. Machelle Sweeting presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 29, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time240 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 14, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 29, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 14, 2020ANSWER
Date: July 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 62 FOR REVIEW Judge: SWEETING, J. MACHELLE (DCM) |
|
September 21, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) PAPERLESS PART NO APPEARANCE FOR REVIEW Judge: SWEETING, J. MACHELLE (DCM) |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion | |
August 14, 2020 | Motion |
CHANGE VENUE (Motion #001) Decided: 10/26/2020CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: SWEETING, J. MACHELLE (DCM) Answer demanded: Yes Judge: SWEETING, J. MACHELLE (DCM) |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) NO FEE LETTER |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Demand to Change Venue/Stipulation/Answer |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B summons and complaint |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Claim |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION affirmation in support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.