Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
60Th Street Development Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Krassner, Mark, against Bridal Flowers Exclusive Inc., Rachael S. Trimarco, Individually And D B A Bridal Flowers Exclusive, represented by Bronstein, Joshua Reid, Forde, James L., in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Barry R. Ostrager presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions334 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time944 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 06, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 04, 2016SUR-REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 30, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 19, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 04, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 29, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 20, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 20, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 05, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 09, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 07, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 22, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 29, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 31, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 08, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: April 24, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 18, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: September 07, 2016REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 05, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 30, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 04, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 18, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 14, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 22, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 01, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 22, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 17, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 14, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 20, 2015PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: October 04, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 16, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 11, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT CORRECTION TO PRIOR NOTICE |
||
December 09, 2020 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Notice of Neutral Evaluation Program - Commercial Division - Supreme NY Civil |
||
June 12, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 05, 2017 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
June 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #007) IAS Motion 61EFM 2:15PM (Conversion) Judge: Ostrager, Hon. Barry R. |
|
June 02, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #007) IAS MOTION 61EFM 2:15PM Judge: OSTRAGER, BARRY R. |
|
May 23, 2017 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Barry R. Ostrager |
||
May 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #007) Adjourned For Working Copies 9:30AM (Conversion) Judge: Ostrager, Hon. Barry R. |
|
May 18, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #007) ADJOURNED FOR WORKING COPIES 9:30AM Judge: OSTRAGER, BARRY R. |
|
May 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #007) E-Filing Submissions Calendar FOR MOT (Conversion) Judge: Ostrager, Hon. Barry R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.