Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vernita Damon, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Garafola, George J, against Abj Chosen, Llc, represented by Miller, Jeffrey R, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 11, 2020ANSWER
Date: October 08, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: December 28, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 29, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 29, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 09, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: April 12, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
April 12, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
December 06, 2021 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
November 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Remote Conference Part 11:30 A.M., REMOTE CONFERENCE (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
July 09, 2021 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
June 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Held Remote Conference Part Supreme Trial; 12:30 P.M., SEE NYSCEF DOC. 11 (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
February 08, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Held Remote Conference Part Supreme Initial (first time on); 4:00 P.M., SEE NYSCEF DOC. 10 (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
December 28, 2020 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
October 29, 2020 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.