Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
New York Marine And General Insurance Company And Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S A S O 2133 3Rd Avenue Corp., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gallin, Fredric P, against Global Luxury Services Inc., Ny Fire Service & Installation Inc, Ny Firetech Inc, represented by Bilbao, Cesar Oswaldo, Dougherty Howard, Kelsey, Grandison, Sasha Renee, Mahon, Kaela Ann, Stolyar, Igor, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Sabrina Kraus presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Subro - Property Damage) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 24, 2020ANSWER
Date: May 07, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 25, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 27, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 14, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 04, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2020REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 10, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 05, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 10, 2020THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2020ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: November 05, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 05, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 25, 2020ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: June 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 13, 2020PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: July 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 16, 2020REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: December 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 02, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 05, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 02, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 06, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 24, 2020ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: December 14, 2020ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: December 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Policy Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: May 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 03, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: April 28, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: May 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: May 12, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 30, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 30, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 28, 2022STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION
Date: April 27, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 28, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 02, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 13, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B NY MARINE INSURANCE POLICY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 20, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 19, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 20, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 24, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 21, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: March 01, 2023STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 14, 2023ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2023 |
ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE SO ORDERED |
||
March 14, 2023 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice as to Nationwide only |
||
March 01, 2023 |
ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE SO ORDERED |
||
February 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Letter of Good faith to Third-Party Defendant DE JIN LIN d/b/a NEW WOK EXPRESS and DE JIN LIN |
||
January 24, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demands to Plaintiffs |
||
January 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice for Discovery & Inspection to New Wok Express |
||
January 20, 2023 | Notice of Deposition to New Wok Express | ||
January 11, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Letter of Good faith to Plaintiff NEW YORK MARINE AND GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND CERTAIN UNDERWRI Letter of Good faith to Plaintiff NEW YORK MARINE AND GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND CERTAIN UNDERWRI ... show more |
||
December 20, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B NY MARINE INSURANCE POLICY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NY MARINE INSURANCE POLICY Redacted |
||
December 20, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF NATIONWIDE'S COMBINED DEMANDS DATED JULY 5, 2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.