Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Share Washington, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Torigian, Talene Alexandra, against Anita Adams, Desiree Tapia, Isaiah Adams, New York City Transit Authority, represented by Berkson, James Howard, Brizon, Virginie Marie, Chan, Henry, Obrien, Michael P, Pomposello, Michael George, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Denise Dominguez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. The plaintiff, Share Washington, is a resident of Kings County, New York. The defendants named in the complaint are the New York City Transit Authority, Anita ...
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 11, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 02, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: September 26, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 25, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: September 20, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 18, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 17, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 05, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 29, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 10, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) letter to court re: oral argument date |
||
November 21, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) letter re: bus video disc submitted to court |
||
November 02, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit |
||
November 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 30, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Notice to Admit |
||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Left Shoulder Surgery Report |
||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Right Shoulder Surgery Report |
||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Police Report |
||
October 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
October 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Affirmation in Reply to ADAMS Opposition to Cross-Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.