Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Kathryn N. Corkery, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Collen, Peggy Lyn, against Lawrence Allen Putter Dvm, Lenox Hill Veterinarians, Manuel Rodolfo Sanchez Dvm, represented by Mcnamee, Glenn Paul, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Paul A. Goetz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2024 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Veterinary Malpractice) |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
The complaint filed by Plaintiff Kathryn N. Corkery in the Supreme Court of the State of New York alleges negligence and malpractice against Lenox Hill Veterinarians, Dr. Lawrence Allen Putter, and Dr. Manuel Rodolfo Sanchez. The defendants are accus...
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 14, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 17, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 14, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 14, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 14, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Affirmation and Word Count |
||
April 30, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) NOTICE OF APPEAL RE: EMOTIONAL DISTRESS |
||
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) VERIFIED COMPLAINT |
||
April 17, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
March 14, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
March 14, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support/Word Count |
||
March 14, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
March 14, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
March 14, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.