Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Sandra Perez v. 19 Kenmare Realty, Llc,, Little Charlie'S Oyster Bar, Inc., Citi-Urban Management Corp., 19 Kenmare Street Partners Llc, Travertine D/B/A Ken & Cook, Little Charlie'S Clam Bar Inc., The Butcher'S Daughter, Llc
On January 29, 2014 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Frank P Nervo presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2014
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
4 years, 3 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 04, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 04, 2018DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 005)
Date: Mar 23, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: Mar 12, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: Mar 08, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: Mar 07, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: Mar 07, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 005)
Date: Mar 02, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: Feb 26, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: Feb 20, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jan 30, 2018DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: Jan 12, 2018DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 004)
Date: Jan 11, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 004) Corrected
Date: May 17, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 004) Corrected
Date: May 17, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 003)
Date: May 12, 2017ANSWER
Date: Oct 13, 2016STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: Nov 11, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: Nov 11, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 24, 2014DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 29, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 12, 2014DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Aug 12, 2014DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Jul 16, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Jul 01, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Jun 30, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: May 02, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: May 02, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Apr 28, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: Apr 28, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 29, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005) 5/a |
|
March 13, 2018 | hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 4 10:00AM 215K Judge: NERVO, FRANK P. |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see commit #013 |
|
March 12, 2018 | hearing |
TRANSFERRED IAS TRIAL READY 40 9:30AM Judge: MCMAHON, JUDITH REEVES |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED SEE COMMIT #011 |
|
March 08, 2018 | hearing |
JURY SELECTION IAS TRIAL READY 40 9:30AM Judge: MCMAHON, JUDITH REEVES |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED SEE COMMIT #010 |
|
March 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see commit #009 |
|
March 06, 2018 | Motion |
PRECLUDE (Motion #005) Decided: 03/20/2018SEE DECISION Before Justice: SILVER, GEORGE J. Answer demanded: No Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
March 06, 2018 | hearing |
JURY SELECTION IAS TRIAL READY 40 9:30AM Judge: MCMAHON, JUDITH REEVES |
|
March 05, 2018 | hearing |
JURY SELECTION IAS TRIAL READY 40 9:30AM Judge: MCMAHON, JUDITH REEVES |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) Defendant's Expert 3101(d) |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #005) Affirmation in Support |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005) Order to Show Cause |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see commit #008 |
|
February 22, 2018 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS TRIAL READY 40 9:30A.M. Judge: LEIBOVITZ, WILLIAM JHO |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see commit 007 |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order dated 1/10/2018 |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003) | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) | |
January 01, 2018 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #005) IAS MOTION 10EFM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
September 20, 2017 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 10 10:00AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
September 20, 2017 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 10 10:00AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
September 20, 2017 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
August 07, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) IAS MOTION 10EFM 10:00AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
August 07, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) IAS MOTION 10EFM 10:00AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
August 07, 2017 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
June 05, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 9:30AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
June 05, 2017 | hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 9:30AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
May 22, 2017 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) *Corrected* Motion For DeFault Judgment |
|
May 17, 2017 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #004) Decided: 01/10/2018SEE DECISION Before Justice: SILVER, GEORGE J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #004) ANSWER |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #004) *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE and LEGAL BACK |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #004) *Corrected* LETTER CORRESPONDENCE |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004) *Corrected* AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004) *Corrected* SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004) *Corrected* SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) *Corrected* AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) | |
May 12, 2017 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #003) Decided: 01/10/2018SEE DECISION Before Justice: SILVER, GEORGE J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #003) Lease Agreement |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Plaintiff's EBT |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Bill of Particulars |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #003) Answer to Amended Complaint |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Affidavit of Service upon Travertine |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Supplemental Summons & Amended Complaint |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Summons & Complaint |
|
May 12, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003) | |
May 11, 2017 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
April 05, 2017 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
February 02, 2017 | hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
August 01, 2016 | hearing |
REMAND JUDICIAL MEDIATION Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
July 07, 2016 | hearing |
ADJOURNED JUDICIAL MEDIATION Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
February 16, 2016 | hearing |
REMAND STATUS CONFERENCE 10 9:30AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
ADMISSION OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service ( Little Charlies Clam Bar) |
|
November 17, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 10 9:30AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
November 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S) Stipulation to Supplement Summons and Amend Complaint |
|
November 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint |
|
November 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) Supplemental Summons |
|
June 30, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 10 9:30AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
June 05, 2015 | hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PRE-TRIAL 10 9:30AM Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Good Faith | |
December 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID) | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOTICE OF INQUEST |
|
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT entered in the office of the County Clerk |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 1 |
|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
July 22, 2014 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR NO OPP Judge: TINGLING, M.A. |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 16, |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Motion For DeFault Judgment |
|
July 01, 2014 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #002) Decided: 08/06/2014MOTN DISP. AS IND. SET/ORDER Before Justice: TINGLING, M.A. Answer demanded: No Judge: TINGLING, M.A. |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit Of Service |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) EXHIBIT D |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) EXHIBIT C |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) EXHIBIT B |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) EXHIBIT A |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) Affirmation |
|
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation Withdrawing Motion |
|
June 03, 2014 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 07/10/2014SEE DECISION Before Justice: TINGLING, M.A. Answer demanded: No Judge: TINGLING, M.A. |
|
June 03, 2014 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR NO OPP Judge: TINGLING, M.A. |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) RJI- re- Motion For Default |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) EXHIBIT D |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) EXHIBIT C |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) EXHIBIT B |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) EXHIBIT A |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer on behalf of defendant 19 Kenmore Relaty, LLC and Citi-Urban Managment w/Cross-Claim against |
|
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |