Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Anzhella Rabayeva, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Goidel, Jonathan M., Rabinovich, Yevgeny, against 140 Bw, Llc, Abm Industries, Inc., Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Union Investment Real Estate, Xyz, (total of 5) See All represented by Mantione, Steven K., Pak, Dennis June, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Joan Kenney presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management225 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time414 days |
ANSWER
Date: March 31, 2014NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 02, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 14, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 13, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 02, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 17, 2014RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 03, 2014RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 23, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 27, 2014ANSWER
Date: May 21, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2015 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 8 10:00 A.M. STD F/W CC 1/13/15 Judge: KENNEY, JOAN M. |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 11, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 8 9:30 A.M. SOS Judge: KENNEY, JOAN M. |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #002, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Septe |
|
August 14, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 8 9;30 A.M. Judge: KENNEY, JOAN M. |
|
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Preliminary Conference adjourned to 09-11-14 |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND includes affidavit of service, but no meds |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D MRI reports |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Physical therapy notes |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Dr. Poroger meds |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.