Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Terell Frith, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Jaroslawicz, David, against Citywide Mobile Response Corp., Karlim S. Edmonds, represented by Fitch, Robert Anthony, Montgomery, Steven R, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Arlene P Bluth presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time506 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 20, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 17, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 16, 2015ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 20, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 18, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2015 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM DISC.BY STIP FILED 6/15/15 Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Re: Appearance #003, OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 16, 2015 |
|
March 13, 2015 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #002, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 17 |
|
February 13, 2015 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Re: Appearance #001, OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 18, 2014 |
|
December 15, 2014 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM 9:30AM Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE letter transmitting case scheduling order to defense counsel |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING CASE SCHEDULING ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 20, 2014 comm 002 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.