Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Elisa Montalvo, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Benmorits, Sherri, against Housing Works Housing Development Fund Corporation, Housing Works Inc., represented by Garry, Daniel John, Wagman, Eric Matthew, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Barbara Jaffe presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management162 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1120 days |
ANSWER
Date: May 09, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 20, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 17, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 24, 2015SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: June 25, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 18, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2017 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 250K Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
December 16, 2016 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
October 07, 2016 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
August 11, 2016 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
June 28, 2016 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
June 21, 2016 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
February 09, 2016 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
December 14, 2015 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
October 27, 2015 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 10:30 @80CENTRE-RM106 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
|
October 20, 2015 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-1 10:30 A.M. @80CENTRE-RM106 Judge: VIGILANTE, MILES J. (AR) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.