Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
United Site Services Northeast, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Murphy, Dennis D, against Aurora Productions Inc., Threesixty Entertainment Llc Dba 360 Entertainment, Threesixty Entertainment Ltd. Dba 360 Entertainment, represented by Brickell, Jamie M, Ratish, Robert W, Siegel, Rebecca Marie, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Robert R Reed presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time357 days |
ANSWER
Date: March 21, 2014ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 20, 2014ANSWER
Date: October 15, 2014ANSWER
Date: June 04, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 22, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 21, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 01, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 01, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER (AMENDED) | |
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Aurora Production Inc.'s Answer to Second Amended Complaint |
|
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Second Amended Complaint |
|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #002, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Septe |
|
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE *Corrected* | |
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.