Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
American Transit Insurance Company v. Ana Gonzalez, Assoc. In Emergency Services, Columbus Imaging Center Llc, Excel Surgery Center, L.L.C., Medalliance Medical Health Services, Inc., Mosaic Medical, P.C., Neal M. Lisann, M.D., P.C. Dba Empire Medic…
On January 29, 2014 a contract (non-commercial) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Eileen Rakower presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2014
Last Refreshed
January 26, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Contract (Non-Commercial)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
DECISION ORDER ON MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Apr 22, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 24, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Feb 24, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Mar 21, 2014SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 29, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 22 |
|
March 20, 2015 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
March 20, 2015 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 04/21/2015CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. Answer demanded: No Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #001) Follow-Up Mailing Affidavit |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Stipulation |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Pleadings |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Denial |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Scheduling Letters |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Application for Benefits and Attorney Letter of Representation |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Copy of Policy |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Supporting Affidavits |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service for RJI |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE tatiana pavlova md |
|
March 21, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EIP |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE assoc in emerency med |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |