Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Transit Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sullivan, James F, against Carlos R. Nunez, Cblpath, Inc., Central Queens Day Surgical Center, Inc. Dba Queens Surgi-Center, Forest Hills Medical, P.C., Grand Street Medical, Pllc, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE eip |
||
February 28, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE laxmidhar diwan md |
||
February 20, 2014 |
AFFIDAVIT SOS AFFIDAVIT |
||
February 19, 2014 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JAYANT GANDHI MD |
||
January 29, 2014 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.