Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Joao Reyes, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Tomkiel, Stanley A, against 423 West 55Th Street, Llc, Resource Construction Corp., West 55Th Street Building, Llc, represented by Gordon, Brian, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Cynthia S Kern presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time866 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 20, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 13, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 01, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 09, 2015ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: April 25, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 24, 2014ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: October 07, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 07, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 03, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontining Action with Prejudice |
|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney for Related Companies, L.P. |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
February 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #006, COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Februa |
|
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Re: Appearance #005, PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on Octob |
|
October 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CONSOLIDATION Re: Appearance #001, ORDER DIRECTING CONSOLIDATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on Octo |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
June 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.