Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Ethel Gitlin, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Werner, Michael Shea, against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., L.L.C., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc., Sanofi Us Services Inc., represented by Caterina, Jessica Rubin, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Martin Shulman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1342 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014ANSWER
Date: December 12, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2017 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) IAS PART 1 Judge: SHULMAN, MARTIN (MT) |
|
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Voluntary Discontinuance with Prejudice |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Short Form Complaint |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of appearance of attorney Michael S. Werner, Esq |
|
June 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA) Request for Judicial Intervention Pursuant to Administrative Order |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon defendant SANOFI-SYNTHELABO INC |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon defendant SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC |
|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon defendant SANOFI-AVENTIS US INC |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Short Form Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.