Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Joseph Casarole, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Werner, Michael Shea, against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., L.L.C., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc., Sanofi Us Services Inc., represented by Caterina, Jessica Rubin, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Martin Shulman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1626 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 06, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 13, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 05, 2018ANSWER
Date: December 12, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 25, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 09, 2018 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE STATUS CONFERENCE 1 Judge: SHULMAN, MARTIN (MT) |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Voluntary Discontinuance with Prejudice |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Short Form Complaint |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of appearance of attorney Michael S. Werner, Esq |
|
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
March 17, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: SHULMAN, MARTIN |
|
March 12, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: KERN, CYNTHIA S. (MT) |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) NOTICE OFWITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROVIDE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.