Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Matthew Capps v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Sanofi-Aventis U.S., L.L.C., Sanofi Us Services Inc., Sanofi-Synthelabo, Inc.
On January 29, 2014 a tort case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Martin Shulman presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 29, 2014
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
4 years, 7 months and 0 days
Overview
Causes of Action
X FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION – NEGLIGENCE X SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION – STRICT PRODUCTS LIABILITY – DEFECTIVE DESIGN
X SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION – STRICT PRODUCTS LIABILITY – DEFECTIVE DESIGN
X THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION – STRICT PRODUCTS LIABILITY – MANUFACTURING DEFECT
X FOURTH CAUSE OF ACTION – STRICT PRODUCTS LIABILITY – FAILURE TO WARN
5. – BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY
X SIXTH CAUSE OF ACTION – BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTIES
7. – FRAUDULENT MISREPRESENTATION
8. – FRAUDULENT CONCEALMENT
X NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION – NEGLIGENT MISREPRESENTATION
10. – FRAUD AND DECEIT
X ELEVENTH CAUSE OF ACTION – CONSUMER FRAUD
12. – LOSS OF CONSORTIUM
13. – WRONGFUL DEATH
X FOURTEENTH CAUSE OF ACTION – PUNITIVE DAMAGES
PLAINTIFF(S) ASSERT/S THE FOLLOWING ADDITIONAL CAUSES OF ACTION/CASE- SPECIFIC PLEADINGS/CASE-SPECIFIC FACTS [ATTACH ADDITIONAL PAGES AS
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 27, 2018ANSWER
Date: Dec 12, 2016SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 29, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2018 | hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE STATUS CONFERENCE 1 Judge: SHULMAN, MARTIN (MT) |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Voluntary Discontinuance with Prejudice |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Short Form Complaint |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of appearance of attorney Michael S. Werner, Esq |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA) Request for Judicial Intervention Pursuant to Administrative Order |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon defendant Sanofi Sythelabo Inc |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon defendant Sanofi US LLC |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service upon defendant Sanofi US Services INC |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Verified Short Form Complaint |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Bristol- Myers Squibb Company |