Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Dan Rodriguez v. Fawn East Fourth Street Llc, Citi-Urban Management Corp.
On January 16, 2019 a torts - other (premises - labor law) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 16, 2019
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Torts - Other (Premises - Labor Law)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jul 28, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jan 30, 2020ANSWER
Date: Mar 11, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 05, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 01, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 16, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
|
April 28, 2020 | hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE STATUS CONFERENCE 8 Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
January 28, 2020 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 8 Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
October 29, 2019 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 8 Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
June 11, 2019 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 8 9:30 CONSENT Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
June 04, 2019 | hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 8 Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Defendants' Verified Answer with Demands |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |