Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carmen Romero, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Rubin, Steven A, against And The New York City Department Of Education, Consolidated Edison Company Of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., The City Of New York, The New York City Department Of Transportation, (total of 5) See All represented by Costello, J Mcgarry, Counsel, Corporation, Harris, Cecily Ann, Morano, Cory Morgan, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Judy Kim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Kim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 05, 2019STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: September 13, 2019ANSWER
Date: November 05, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 05, 2019ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 14, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 16, 2019ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: May 17, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 12, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 27, 2019NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 27, 2019NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: February 25, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 29, 2021URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: March 20, 2020NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: May 31, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 03, 2020ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: April 01, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: March 12, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: March 12, 2019NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: June 22, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: May 31, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 12, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: June 22, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 15, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 08, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 13, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 07, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 10, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
September 13, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
July 21, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
July 08, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND City Response to Plaintiffs NTA |
||
June 22, 2022 | Notice to Admit (City) with Exhibits A and B | ||
June 22, 2022 | Notice to Admit (ConEd) with Exhibit A | ||
May 31, 2022 | Notice to Admit (to ConEd) | ||
May 31, 2022 | Notice to Admit (to City) | ||
May 31, 2022 | Notice to Admit (to City) 2 | ||
April 01, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.