Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Daniel Cohen, Lisa Lowy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Seidel, Barry S, against Constance Cohen, represented by Fox, David L., Kline, Jonathan, Sanchez, Roselvin, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Eileen Rakower presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time981 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2015ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: December 08, 2015MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2015ANSWER
Date: June 05, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2016PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #001) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT (Motion #001) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Order & Notice of Entry |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
September 13, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 15EFM 11:30 A.M. ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
September 13, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 15EFM 11:30 A.M. ORAL ARGUMENT Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
September 13, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
January 26, 2016 | Hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (71 THOMAS ST) (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR 2:30PM Judge: RAKOWER, EILEEN A. |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Jonathan Kline in Opposition to Cross-Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.