Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Michelle Jimenez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Epstein, Mark Jay, Jaffe, Michael Eliot, Pazer, Perry, against Lakhwinder Singh, Metro Contracting N.Y., Inc., Prince Contracting, Inc., represented by Greiper, Ellen Hope, Murphy, Austin Patrick, Schwendemann, Edward Vincent, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Ellen Coin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time314 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: November 26, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: May 14, 2014ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #002)
Date: February 18, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: April 16, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 30, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2014STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: October 30, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 16, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002)
Date: December 19, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 21, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: July 30, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 23, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
July 29, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 63EFM 9:30AM Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - TRANSFER (Motion #002) re: motion no. 002, ORDER DIRECTING TRANSFER entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 1 |
|
December 22, 2014 | Hearing |
ORAL ARGUMENT (71 THOMAS ST) (Motion #002) ADJOURNED FOR WORKING COPIES 9:30AM Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation to Plaintiff's Parftial Opposition Papers |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service for Reply Affirmation |
|
December 12, 2014 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
November 28, 2014 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: JAMES, DEBRA A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.