Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Christopher Repetsky, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Karlin, Stewart Lee, against American University Of Antigua, Manipal Education Americas, Llc, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with David B. Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2017 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time15 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: January 10, 2017RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 10, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 25, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 17, 2017PETITION
Date: January 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2017 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) IAS Motion 58EFM 9;30AM (Conversion) Judge: Cohen, Hon. David B. |
|
January 25, 2017 | Motion |
Article 78 (Body or Officer) (Motion #001) Decided: 01/25/2017Decided Before Justice: Cohen, Hon. David B. Answer demanded: No Judge: Cohen, Hon. David B. |
|
January 25, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 58EFM 9;30AM Judge: COHEN, DAVID BENJAMIN |
|
January 25, 2017 | Motion |
ARTICLE 78 (Motion #001) Decided: 01/25/2017CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: COHEN, DAVID BENJAMIN Answer demanded: No Judge: COHEN, DAVID BENJAMIN |
|
January 23, 2017 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 18, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Manipal Education Americas, LLC |
||
January 18, 2017 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE American University of Antigua |
||
January 17, 2017 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 10, 2017 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected* Aff. in Support of Shortened Time to Respond and Expedited Heaing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.