Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Swan Moore, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Fils-Aime, Steve, against City Of New York, represented by , Bila, Anthony, Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with J. Machelle Sweeting presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Slip/Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 31, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 23, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 31, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 29, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 05, 2023STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 18, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 09, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 18, 2023 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Stipulation |
||
October 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003) Cited case law |
||
October 31, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
October 23, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #003) response to statement of material facts |
||
October 23, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003) affirmation in opposition |
||
October 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) word count certification |
||
September 26, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #003) stipulation to adjourn motion to 10/31/2023 |
||
September 15, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) Exhibit H: NYC Dept of Transportation survey assessment form public website |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.