Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Barone Steel Fabricators, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Carlucci, Anthony P., Hand, Jared Arden, Ward, Richard Thomas, against Argonaut Insurance Company, Interstate Mechanical Services, Inc., represented by Bonacci, Joanne Marie, Lipari, David P, Lipari, David Peter, Pfeiffer, Kevin Ngo, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Eileen Rakower presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time859 days |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: April 15, 2014COMPLAINT
Date: March 07, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 27, 2014ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 06, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 18, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 27, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 29, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 06, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: February 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
May 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter Re: New Note of Issue Date |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #002, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 29, 2 |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Reply to Interstate's Counterclaim |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.