Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Michael Dispigno, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Maldonado, Mercedes Marie, against Cynthia Brann, The City Of New York, The New York City Department Of Correction, represented by Yaqoob, Mohammad Adil, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Melissa Anne Crane presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time183 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 08, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001)
Date: April 15, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001)
Date: May 16, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 05, 2019ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: May 10, 2019STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: February 01, 2019NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: January 08, 2019NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2019PETITION
Date: January 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
July 10, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) IAS PART 15 Judge: CRANE, MELISSA ANNE |
|
July 10, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR SOS 07/27 SATURDAY Judge: CRANE, MELISSA ANNE |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | |
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
May 28, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR SOS 07/27 SATURDAY Judge: CRANE, MELISSA ANNE |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001) | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.