Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
1560 Associates, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Levy, Robert S, Parikh, Pragna, against Yjy, Inc. Dba Andre & Arlette Cleaners, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Lynn R Kotler presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial (General) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions197 days |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time346 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 17, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 06, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 29, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 29, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 23, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2014JUDGMENT
Date: December 19, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 27, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
February 06, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) IAS PART 8 SEE ORDER DATED 1/15/19 Judge: KOTLER, LYNN R. |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
July 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) re: motion no. 001, DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 17, |
|
July 09, 2014 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 07/15/2014SEE DECISION Before Justice: KENNEY, JOAN M. Answer demanded: No Judge: KENNEY, JOAN M. |
|
July 09, 2014 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR NO OPP Judge: KENNEY, JOAN M. |
|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.