Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Michael Gabbidon, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Smith, Steven, against Yuriy Amirov, represented by Crisci, Vincent Paul, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Arlene P Bluth presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time552 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 20, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 20, 2014ANSWER
Date: February 12, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 12, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 25, 2015ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: August 19, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2015 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #005, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 28, 2 |
|
April 27, 2015 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Re: Appearance #004, SO ORDERED STIPULATION entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 25 |
|
February 23, 2015 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
January 12, 2015 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ADJOURND COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
December 01, 2014 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ADJOURND COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM 9:30 ADV. FROM 3/6/14 Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
September 22, 2014 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ADJOURND COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 22 DCM Judge: BLUTH, ARLENE P. (DCM) |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING CASE SCHEDULING ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 19, 2014 COMM 002 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.