Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Samuel Levison, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Hendele, Alison Cannata, against Modern Cab Corp., Party Rental, Ltd., Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Sha Huang, William Guerrero, (total of 5) See All represented by Belmonte, Josefina A, Mcevoy, John Philip, Moskovits, Ronit Z, Seldin, Stacy Roxane, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Adam Silvera presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1856 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: February 10, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: July 27, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 01, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 01, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 17, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 01, 2017ANSWER
Date: February 06, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 10, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #005)
Date: November 09, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 17, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: March 16, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 01, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #005)
Date: November 04, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 17, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 13, 2014COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 26, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 17, 2015ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 22, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #005)
Date: November 03, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 18, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 28, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: December 21, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: September 21, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #005)
Date: November 03, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 04, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002)
Date: November 21, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: January 26, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 24, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: October 28, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: March 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #005)
Date: November 04, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: February 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 22, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 08, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: February 24, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 12, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 05, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #007)
Date: March 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: November 21, 2014STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: August 12, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: April 11, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: July 27, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 16, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: February 18, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: January 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: February 19, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 05, 2019PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: October 10, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: October 11, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: September 01, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: September 01, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 04, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #006)
Date: December 21, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 26, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #005)
Date: December 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: November 19, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: December 15, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #005)
Date: September 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #005)
Date: September 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: February 21, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: February 21, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: February 13, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #006)
Date: February 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 06, 2018 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL IAS TRIAL READY 40 75K 60 CENTRE ST.RM.422 Judge: MCMAHON, JUDITH REEVES |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 008 |
|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED see comment 007 |
|
April 26, 2018 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD JUDICIAL MEDIATION 9:30A.M. 60 CENTRE ST.RM.422 Judge: MCMAHON, JUDITH REEVES |
|
April 09, 2018 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-2 9:30AM W/452435/15 Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
March 02, 2018 | Hearing |
TRIAL READY CASE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-2 9:30AM W/452435/15 Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
January 12, 2018 | Hearing |
TRIAL READY CASE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-2 9:30AM W/452435/15 Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
November 08, 2017 | Hearing |
TRIAL READY CASE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-2 9:30 W/452435/15 Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
November 01, 2017 | Hearing |
TRIAL READY CASE ADJOURNED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE-2 9:30 W/452435/15 Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.