Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Consolidated Edison Company Of New York, Inc.,, filed a(n) Other Special Proceeding case represented by Kim, Sung-Teak D, against Jpmorgan Chase Bank, Na,, Patricia Zebler, Richard Zebler, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Michael Stallman presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2014 |
CategoryOther Special Proceeding |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time25 days |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: January 28, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 04, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2014NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2014PETITION
Date: January 06, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 04, 2014 |
|
January 31, 2014 | Motion |
TURNOVER PROCEEDING (Motion #001) Decided: 01/31/2014SEE DECISION Before Justice: STALLMAN, MICHAEL D. Answer demanded: No Judge: STALLMAN, MICHAEL D. |
|
January 31, 2014 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. (PRE-NOTE) IAS PART 21 Judge: STALLMAN, MICHAEL D. |
|
January 31, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR STIP Judge: STALLMAN, MICHAEL D. |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) Notice of Withdrawal |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Notice of Withdrawal Ex. 1 with Affidavit of Service attached. |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affiidavit of Service |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) Request for Judicial Intevention |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) Notice of Verified Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.