Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Nere Li Development, Llc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Lum, Robert J., against 53 Pitt Development, Llc, represented by Butnick, Joshua Adam, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Carol Edmead presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2019 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Rpapl 881) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time71 days |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: March 10, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #002)
Date: March 15, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 18, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002)
Date: February 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #002)
Date: February 20, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: February 20, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 30, 2019RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 03, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: January 03, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: January 03, 2019PETITION
Date: January 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #002) | |
March 15, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 35 9:30 AM ORAL ARG Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
March 10, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #002) | |
March 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 22, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) IAS MOTION 35 9:30 AM ORAL ARG Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #002) | |
February 21, 2019 | Motion |
PUNISH FOR CONTEMPT (Motion #002) Decided: 03/15/2019CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: EDMEAD, CAROL R. Answer demanded: No Judge: EDMEAD, CAROL R. |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Invoice for Petitioner's Attorneys' Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.