Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thomas Mullen, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Decolator, Joseph L, against The City Of New York, represented by Friedlander, Jeffrey Douglas, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with George J. Silver presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time2227 days |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 26, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 21, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 06, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 08, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 25, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 07, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 25, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 09, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 27, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 18, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 02, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 11, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 23, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 19, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 04, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 27, 2019ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: June 09, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 16, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 19, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 23, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2020 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL LAST CLEAR CHANCE-CITY SETTLED $250,000 TRIAL 03/30/20 9:30. Judge: SILVER, GEORGE J. |
|
January 30, 2020 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30 AM FINAL Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
January 16, 2020 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30 AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
December 19, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30 AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
November 21, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30 AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
October 31, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30 AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
October 03, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30 AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
September 05, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30 AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
July 30, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30 AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
|
June 11, 2019 | Hearing |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE HELD EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 9:30AM Judge: WILKENFELD, SAMUEL E. (AR) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.