Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Richard Zletz, Jennie Zletz v. Wvh Housing Development Fund Corporation, Residential Management Group, Llc d/b/a Douglas Elliman Property Management, Lawrence Properties, Inc.
On January 02, 2014 a contract (non-commercial) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of New York County. Judge Shlomo S. Hagler presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 02, 2014
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
New York County, NY
Filing Court House
New York County Supreme Court
Category
Contract (Non-Commercial)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
5 years and 27 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 28, 2019DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Feb 23, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: Feb 23, 2018ANSWER
Date: Feb 22, 2018REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: Feb 05, 2018DECISION ORDER ON MOTION
Date: Dec 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Nov 17, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Nov 17, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Nov 17, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: Jul 31, 2017THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: Jul 24, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 24, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: Apr 14, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: Dec 29, 2016DEMAND FOR:
Date: Dec 29, 2016DEMAND FOR:
Date: Dec 29, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 18, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
December 10, 2018 | hearing |
Settled Status Conference 17 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
December 10, 2018 | hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT (PRE-NOTE) STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
September 12, 2018 | hearing |
Held Status Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
September 12, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
August 06, 2018 | hearing |
Adjourned Status Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
August 06, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
March 26, 2018 | hearing |
Held Status Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
March 26, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER 3rd Pty Def Skyline |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
December 18, 2017 | hearing |
Held Status Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
December 18, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
December 05, 2017 | hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) E-Filing Submissions Calendar Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
December 05, 2017 | hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #001) E-FILING SUBMISSIONS CALENDAR Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 17, 2017 | Motion |
Judgment - Default (Motion #001) Decided: 12/19/2017Decided Before Justice: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. Answer demanded: No Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) third party summons and complaint |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) LETTER |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit |
|
November 17, 2017 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 12/19/2017SEE DECISION Before Justice: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. Answer demanded: No Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 23, 2017 | hearing |
Held Status Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
October 23, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
September 11, 2017 | hearing |
Adjourned Status Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
September 11, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE ADJOURNED STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to Adjourn Conference |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
July 31, 2017 | hearing |
Held Status Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
July 31, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Rule 3402(B) Statement |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons With Notice |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | |
May 01, 2017 | hearing |
Held Status Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
May 01, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD STATUS CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Combined Demands |
|
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Verifed Bill of Particulars |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
March 20, 2017 | hearing |
Held Compliance Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
March 20, 2017 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
March 06, 2017 | hearing |
Adjourned Compliance Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
March 06, 2017 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ADJOURND COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
January 23, 2017 | hearing |
Adjourned Compliance Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
January 23, 2017 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ADJOURND COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to Adjourn Compliance Conference |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Notice of Discovery and Information |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Witness Information |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Expert Witness Information |
|
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Address |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
November 07, 2016 | hearing |
Held Compliance Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
November 07, 2016 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
August 01, 2016 | hearing |
Adjourned Compliance Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
August 01, 2016 | hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ADJOURND COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to Adjourn Compliance Conference |
|
February 01, 2016 | hearing |
Held IAS Preliminary Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
February 01, 2016 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
December 21, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned IAS Preliminary Conference 17 Supreme Trial; 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
December 21, 2015 | hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
November 23, 2015 | hearing |
Adjourned IAS Preliminary Conference 17 Supreme Initial (first time on); 11:00 AM (Conversion) Judge: Hagler, Hon. Shlomo S. |
|
November 23, 2015 | hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 17 11:00 AM Judge: HAGLER, SHLOMO S. |
|
November 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE Stipulation to Adjourn Preliminary Conference |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | |
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention |
|
September 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) and DEMAND FOR SERVICE OF COMPLAINT |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Summons with Notice |