Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mimosa Equities Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Goldberg, Matthew L, against Acj Associates Llc, Jadam Equities Llc, represented by Ramsen, John Spencer, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Ellen Coin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2014 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1239 days |
REMITTITUR
Date: January 20, 2016NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: December 18, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 02, 2014ANSWER
Date: December 16, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 09, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001)
Date: May 07, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 09, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001)
Date: May 02, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #001)
Date: April 03, 2014PRE-ARGUMENT STATEMENT
Date: December 18, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 17, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2017 | Hearing |
DISCONTINUED PRE-NOTE IAS PART 63 STIP. OF DISC. Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 20, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED WITHOUT A DATE IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 63 2:00PM Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
June 29, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 63 2:00PM Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
June 08, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 63 2:00PM Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
May 04, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 63 2:00PM Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
March 30, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 63 2:00PM Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
February 03, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIM CONFERENCE ADJOURNED IAS PRELIM CONFERENCE 63 2:00PM Judge: COIN, ELLEN M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.