Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Signature Bank, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Koop, Scott E, Thomas, Jaclyn E, against A2Z Stores Inc., Norman Zabowsky, Norman Zabrowsky A K A, Norman Zarbrowsky A K A, represented by Ehrenfeld, Samuel A, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts New York County Supreme Court with Anil Singh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 27, 2010 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseNew York County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time282 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: October 27, 2010JUDGMENT
Date: August 05, 2011MOTION PAPERS (Motion #001)
Date: October 27, 2010DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2011ANSWER
Date: October 27, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 05, 2011 | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Affirmation |
|
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate requesting entry of judgment | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Judgment |
|
March 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 03, 2011 |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID) summons & complaint |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION PAPERS (Motion #001) Motion Papers (Hard Copy) |
|
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event | answer | |
October 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION county clerks minute prior to conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.