Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Moulton, Hon. Peter H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2016 |
CategorySp-Cplr Article 78 (Body Or Officer) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time368 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) IAS Motion 50 2:30 PM, NAP (Conversion) Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
May 10, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 50 2:30 PM NAP Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
February 17, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Support Office 2:30 PM, ARTICLE 78 (Conversion) Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
February 17, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION SUPPORT OFFICE 2:30 PM ARTICLE 78 Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
May 22, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Submissions Part Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
May 22, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) SUBMISSIONS PART Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
May 08, 2015 | Motion |
Article 78 (Body or Officer) (Motion #001) Decided: 05/19/2016Decided Before Justice: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. Answer demanded: No Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
May 08, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Submissions Part Judge: Chan, Hon. Margaret A. |
|
May 08, 2015 | Motion |
ARTICLE 78 (Motion #001) Decided: 05/19/2016CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: MOULTON, PETER H. Answer demanded: No Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
May 08, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) SUBMISSIONS PART Judge: CHAN, MARGARET A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.