Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Feifei Gu, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Uber Technologies Inc., represented by Armstrong, Anne Elizabeth, Rosenberg, Peter David, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Lisa S. Headley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 09, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 09, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 20, 2023COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 06, 2023APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: June 06, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 04, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: July 04, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 04, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 04, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
October 09, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
July 20, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 18, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
July 04, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 04, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's Answer |
||
July 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint of 100186/2023 |
||
July 04, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
July 04, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
July 04, 2023 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Motion to consolidate with case 100186/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.