Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Moulton, Hon. Peter H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2016 |
CategorySp-Cplr Article 78 (Body Or Officer) |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time551 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) IAS Motion 50 NO APPEARANCE, STIP OF DISC (Conversion) Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
August 30, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 50 NO APPEARANCE STIP OF DISC Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
May 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) IAS Motion 50 NO APPEARANCE, STIP OF DISC (Conversion) Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
May 02, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 50 NO APPEARANCE STIP OF DISC Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
April 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) IAS Motion 50 NO APPEARANCE, CTRL DATE (Conversion) Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
April 20, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 50 NO APPEARANCE CTRL DATE Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
April 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) IAS Motion 50 NO APPEARANCE, CTRL DATE (Conversion) Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
April 15, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 50 NO APPEARANCE CTRL DATE Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
|
April 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) IAS Motion 50 NO APPEARANCE, CTRL DATE (Conversion) Judge: Moulton, Hon. Peter H. |
|
April 06, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IAS MOTION 50 NO APPEARANCE CTRL DATE Judge: MOULTON, PETER H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.