Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Marev Holdings, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wagner, Stephen, against Charles Margolis, Hlm Capital Llc A K A Hlm Capital Management Group, represented by Levine, Jessica E, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Jerome C. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJerome C. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 27, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Division - Contract |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint filed by Marev Holdings, Inc. against HLM Capital, LLC and Charles Margolis alleges negligence and breach of fiduciary duties. The defendants failed to notify the plaintiff of a redemption deadline for a special purpose acquisition com...
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 09, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 25, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 25, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 25, 2024ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 25, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 14, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: February 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 05, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: February 05, 2024COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2024SUMMONS *Corrected*
Date: November 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
April 09, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) | ||
March 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) the about us page of the website of HLM Capital as displayed on July 9, 2023 |
||
March 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) notice from WFAFN setting forth the relationship |
||
March 25, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #001) Marev Holdings, Inc.'s memorandum of law in opposition to defendants' motion to compel arbitration and dismiss or stay proceedings |
||
March 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Annual Report of HLM Capital, LLC as filed on March 7, 2024 |
||
March 25, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Martin Oliner |
||
March 14, 2024 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stipulation adjourning Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Claims to Arbitration and Stay the Action |
||
February 12, 2024 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Stipulation adjourning Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Claims to Arbitration and Stay the Action to April 11, 2024 |
||
February 05, 2024 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.